Dickerson v. Miller County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Heath Dickerson
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas, Linda Rambo, Janice Nicholson, Dolly Simmons, Trina Owens and Melody Nellie Thomas
Case Number: 4:2009cv04011
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss, and this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Terminating motion 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 31, 2012. (dmc)
March 26, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Further, the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the Plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim and the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to the Plaintiff's denial-of-medical-care and conditions-of-confinement claims. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2012. (mfr)
September 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 8 Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Dolly Simmons and Linda Rambo also constitutes an answer on behalf of Miller County. The clerk is directed to note on the docket sheet that the answer filed on behalf of Sheriff Rambo al so constitutes an answer on behalf of Miller County. Further, the clerk should note on the docket sheet that Miller County is represented by the same counsel as Sheriff Rambo. Attorney C. Burt Newell and Ralph C. Ohm added for Miller County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 2, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Miller County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Nellie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?