Tony Alamo Christian Ministries et al v. Selig et al

Plaintiff: Tony Alamo Christian Ministries, Albert Ralph Krantz and Gregory Scott Seago
Defendant: John M. Selig, Steve Mason and Gwen Lovelace
Case Number: 4:2009cv04031
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 1, 2010. (cap)
August 25, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Quash. Plaintiffs are ordered to narrow the scope of any future requests for production of documents. The Court notes that a response time of less than thirty days for Defendants will be necessary for future requests for production of documents during this limited discovery period. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 25, 2009. (cap)
July 9, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Quash. The subpoena issued to Sgt. John Bishop requiring him to appear for a deposition on July 10, 2009, is hereby quashed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 9, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tony Alamo Christian Ministries et al v. Selig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Alamo Christian Ministries
Represented By: Phillip E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Ralph Krantz
Represented By: Phillip E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Seago
Represented By: Phillip E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?