Hall v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Tommy Dwayne Hall
Defendant: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2009cv04076
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For reasons stated Petitioner Hall's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on May 10, 2011. (lw)
October 9, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 ; denying Motion 9 for Entry of Default filed by Tommy Dwayne Hall. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 9, 2009. (cnn)
September 29, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections filed by Tommy Dwayne Hall, recommending that the motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 29, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Dwayne Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?