Hall v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Tommy Dwayne Hall
Respondent: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2009cv04079
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 40 . Further denying the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tommy Dwayne Hall. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 23, 2010. (sh)
October 9, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 ; denying Motion 8 for Entry of Default filed by Tommy Dwayne Hall. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 9, 2009. (cnn)
September 29, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections filed by Tommy Dwayne Hall be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 29, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tommy Dwayne Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?