Denham v. Stinson

Plaintiff: Billy Joe Denham, Jr.
Defendant: David Stinson
Case Number: 4:2009cv04094
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto for 13 Report and Recommendations; denying 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Billy Joe Denham, Jr.. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 22, 2010. (dmc)
February 22, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Billy Joe Denham, Jr. be denied as appeal is not taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 22, 2010. (cap)
November 9, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 ; denying Motion 3 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Joe Denham, Jr; case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 9, 2009. (wd27 mailed)(cnn)
October 19, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Joe Denham, Jr. be denied and that 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Billy Joe Denham, Jr. be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 19, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denham v. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Denham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?