Williams v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Bernard Williams
Defendant: Major Turner, Nurse Williams, Nash, Kim Villancourt and Correctional Health Care Management
Case Number: 4:2010cv04053
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 6, 2011. (lw)
July 12, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kim Villancourt. All claims against Kim Villancourt are dismissed. Kim Villancourt terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 12, 2011. (cap)
June 8, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 79 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Kim Villancourt. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 8, 2011. (cap)
February 16, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Nurse Williams, Correctional Health Care Management, Kim Villancourt; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tracy Bernard Williams; denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tracy Bernard Williams and denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Major Turner. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 16, 2011. (cap)
September 17, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Nurse Williams, Correctional Health Care Management, Kim Villancourt, Willie Nash. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 17, 2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bernard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Villancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Care Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?