Thompson v. Tuckett et al

Plaintiff: James Ray Thompson, Jr.
Defendant: Shannon Tuckett and Ron Stovall
Case Number: 4:2010cv04113
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 81 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 11, 2013. (cap)
March 26, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2012. (mfr)
July 21, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 38 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ms. Miller, Ms. Halbverse. All claims asserted against Defendant Holliverse are d ismissed. All claims against Defendant Miller are dismissed with the exception of the denial of due process claim. Thus, Defendant Miller remains in this lawsuit. Charlotte Holliverse terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 21, 2011. (cap)
May 12, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendant Shannon Tuckett are DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on May 12, 2011. (mfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Tuckett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ray Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Tuckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?