Patel et al v. Trivedi et al

Plaintiff: Natverlal Patel and Jaswanti Patel
Defendant: Vikram Trivedi and New York Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv04195
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 128 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2015. (mll)
March 20, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2015. (mll)
December 1, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 108 Motion to Compel; granting 110 Motion for Modification of Court Schedule. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 1, 2014. (mll)
September 29, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion for Protective Order. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 29, 2014. (mll)
September 19, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 87 Motion for Leave to File; denying 93 Motion for Protective Order; granting 97 Motion To Shorten Defendant's Time To Respond To Rule 34 Request. Defendant is ordered to produce by October 6, 2014. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 19, 2014. (mll) Modified to correct title on 9/19/2014. (mll)
July 7, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Second Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, denying as moot 70 First Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Luther O'Neal Sutter terminated. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 7, 2014. (mll)
January 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 MOTION TO RELIEVE COUNSEL filed by Jaswanti Patel, Natverlal Patel. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 10, 2014. (mll)
December 19, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 27 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by New York Life Insurance Company, denying 29 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Vikram Trivedi, denying 36 Motion to Set Aside Order, filed by Jaswanti Patel, Natverlal Patel, denying 39 Motion to Alter Judgment filed by Jaswanti Patel, Natverlal Patel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 19, 2012. (cap)
May 7, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, in accordance with 25 Memorandum Opinion and Order, dismissing case with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Any motion for attorneys' fees should be made in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). If no such motion is timely filed, the parties are instructed to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 7, 2012. (cap)
December 8, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting motion for more definite statement contained in 6 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs are ordered to amend their Complaint on or before December 30, 2011 to provide a more definite statement setting forth a specific date or definite timeframe as to when any alleged breach occurred and identification of any specific policy provisions they allege were breached. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 8, 2011. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Trivedi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natverlal Patel
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaswanti Patel
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikram Trivedi
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber W. Bagley
Represented By: Michael Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?