Knowles v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The

Plaintiff: Greg Knowles
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 4:2011cv04044
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332caf
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Standard Fire Insurance Company against Greg Knowles in the amount of $826.00. Plaintiff's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice, and the claims of the purported class are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 5, 2014. (mll)
December 11, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER terminating 40 Motion to Strike or for judgment on the pleadings filed by Standard Fire Insurance Company, The. All deadlines in this case are terminated except for the deadlines articulated in this order. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 11, 2013. (mll)
August 2, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 26 Motion to Remand is DENIED and 26 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 2, 2013. (mll) Modified text on 8/2/2013 (jas).
December 2, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEORANDUM OPPINION AND ORDER granting 6 Motion to Remand. This case shall be remanded forthwith to the Circuit Court of Miller County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 2, 2011. (adw) Modified to add text to title on 12/2/2011 (adw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Knowles
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: Brad E. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?