Johnson v. Stringfellow, et al

Plaintiff: Lonnie Johnson
Defendant: Sharon and Devlin
Case Number: 4:2011cv04099
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Sevier
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 83 Report and Recommendations; granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's remaining claims against Dr. Devlin are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 27, 2015. (mll)
February 25, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Order; granting 81 Motion to Lift Stay. The Clerk is directed to reopen this matter. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 25, 2015. (mll)
January 31, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING CASE until conclusion of appeal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 31, 2014. (mll)
December 19, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 68 Report and Recommendations; denying 67 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to collect $455.00 filing fee pursuant to the terms of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Plaintiff may renew his motion for leave to appeal IFP with the Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 19, 2013. (mll) Modified on 12/19/2013 to add text. (mll)
November 25, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Production, denying 54 Second MOTION to Strike. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 25, 2013. (mll)
September 30, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 Report and Recommendations for 29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sharon, Monte Stringfellow, Devlin. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 30, 2013. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Stringfellow, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?