Jackson v. Nevada County Sheriff's Department

Plaintiff: Timothy Hank Jackson
Defendant: Nevada County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 4:2012cv04023
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2015. (mll)
May 14, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 90 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 17 is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 14, 2014. (mll)
November 15, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 79 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 15, 2013. (mll)
December 19, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 21 Report and Recommendations. Official capacity claims dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants; individual capacity claims dismissed without prejudice as to Danny Martin. Danny Martin terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 19, 2012. (cap)
March 13, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the interests of justice would best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case immediately to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Texarkana Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/12. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 3/13/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Nevada County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hank Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?