Watson v. Stovall et al

Plaintiff: Welton James Watson, II
Defendant: William Floyd, Marty Brazell, Nadia Brown, Carmaletta Williams and Ron Stovall
Case Number: 4:2012cv04028
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 100 Report and Recommendations, granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 12, 2014. (mll)
November 12, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion to Supplement; denying 77 Motion to Supplement; denying 80 Motion to Supplement; denying 84 Motion to Supplement. The Clerk is directed not to file any Supplements to Amended Complaint, Motions to Supplement Amended Complaint or Motions to Amend Complaint from Plaintiff without prior direction from the Court. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 12, 2013. (mll)
August 22, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion for a HIPPA Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 22, 2013. (mll)
January 2, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in toto 41 and denying 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 2, 2013. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Stovall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Brazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmaletta Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welton James Watson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?