Cottrell v. Duke et al

Plaintiff: John Cottrell, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System, Elizabeth L. Tuberville, Kathryn Johnston Lomax and William Cottrell
Defendant: Michael T. Duke, Aida M. Alvarez, James W. Breyer, M. Michelle Burns, James I. Cash, Jr., Roger C. Corbett, Douglas N. Daft, Gregory B. Penner, Steven S. Reinemund, H. Lee Scott, Jr., Arne M. Sorenson, Jim C. Walton, S. Robson Walton, Christopher J. Williams, Linda S. Wolf, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Eduardo Castro-Wright, Thomas A. Mars, Thomas D. Hyde, Lee Stucky, Craig Herkert, Eduardo F. Solorzano Morales and Jose Luis Rodriguezmacedo Rivera
Case Number: 4:2012cv04041
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 109 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Establish Demand Futility. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 7, 2015. (mll)
March 31, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 31, 2015. (mll)
September 26, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2014. (mll)
September 24, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 24, 2014. (mll)
April 15, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Susan O. Hickey for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 15, 2014. (slc)
January 16, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 78 MOTION for Order Entry of Initial Scheduling Order and 79 MOTION to Stay and For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is ext ended until the Court rules on the pending motions. Once the Court rules on the pending motions, 78 and 79 , it will set a specific date by which Defendant must file its answer. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 16, 2014. (mll) Modified on 1/17/2014 to edit text. (mll)
November 27, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER, correcting minor typographical errors, re 7 Amended Order, re 6 Order granting Motion to Stay and administratively terminating case pending resolution of state-court actions in Deleware Court of Chancery. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 27, 2012. Associated Cases: 4:12-cv-04041-SOH et al.(cap)
November 20, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 67 granting 35 Motion to Stay; ***Civil Cases Administratively terminated pending the resolution of the state-court actions in the Delware Court of Chancery. 4:12-cv-04041-SOH; 4:12-cv-04045-SOH; 4:12-cv-04046-SOH; 4:12-cv-04047-SOH; 4:12-cv-04049-SOH; 4:12-cv-04069-SOH; 4:12-cv-04041-SOH. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 20, 2012. (Associated Cases: 4:12-cv-04041-SOH et al (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. Duke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cottrell
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Joseph D. Cohen
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Thomas L. Laughlin
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: Judith S. Scolnick
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L. Tuberville
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Johnston Lomax
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cottrell
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida M. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Michelle Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James I. Cash, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger C. Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Daft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory B. Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven S. Reinemund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Lee Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arne M. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim C. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Robson Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda S. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Castro-Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Mars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Stucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Herkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo F. Solorzano Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Rodriguezmacedo Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?