Morneau v. Sims et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Kellogg Morneau
Defendant: Jackie Runion, Jeffrey Clay Raborn, Justin Smith, Ron Stovall, Duke Schofield, Robert Tibbitt, Mark D Sims and James Wolfe
Case Number: 4:2012cv04109
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 101 Report and Recommendations; granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 18, 2014. (mll)
December 23, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 23, 2013. (mll)
November 21, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff Morneau thirty (30) days from the entry of this order to obtain counsel and notify the court of her new counsel or the Court will assume she is proceeding pro se. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff along with a Manual for Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 21, 2013. (mll)
December 10, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Dismiss official capacity claims. The Court finds that Plaintiff's official capacity claims against Separate Defendants Runion, Rayborn, and Smith should be and hereby are DISMISSED. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2012. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morneau v. Sims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Runion
Represented By: James Felix Goodhart
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clay Raborn
Represented By: James Felix Goodhart
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Represented By: James Felix Goodhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stovall
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Schofield
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tibbitt
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D Sims
Represented By: James A Mijalis
Represented By: Alexander John Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wolfe
Represented By: Bonita K Preuett-Armour
Represented By: Donna M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kellogg Morneau
Represented By: Daniel R Keele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?