Toledano v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Fabian Toledano
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company and Shelter General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv04135
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with jury verdict in favor of Defendants, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company against Plaintiff, Fabian Toledano; August 27, 2014. (cnn)
August 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion in Limine. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 22, 2014. (mll)
June 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 Report and Recommendations; granting 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims based on bad faith are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 6, 2014. (mll)
December 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 13, 2013. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toledano v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Toledano
Represented By: Robert E. Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?