Pankey et al v. Western Arkansas Rock, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Terrell Pankey and Smith County Stone, LLC
Defendant: Western Arkansas Rock, Inc., Amelia Minerals, LLC, David J. Potter, Billy Joe Duffield, Larry Duffield, Luke B. Duffield and Randy Duffield
Counter_claimant: Western Arkansas Rock, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Terrell Pankey and Smith County Stone, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv04046
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 150 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 24, 2015. (mll)
May 13, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Western Arkansas Rock, Inc. against Smith County Stone, LLC, Terrell Pankey in the amount of $460,231.04. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 13, 2015. (mll)
April 10, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 10, 2015. (mll)
March 5, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 95 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant David Potter is dismissed from this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 5, 2015. (mll)
February 20, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Randy Duffield, Luke B. Duffield, Billy Joe Duffield, Amelia Minerals, LLC, Larry Duffield terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 20, 2015. (mll)
September 8, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion to Substitute Party; granting 72 Motion to Withdraw; 65 Motion to Dismiss Party withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 8, 2014. (mll)
February 12, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 12, 2014. (mll)
January 31, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Compel; granting 35 Motion to Compel; granting 36 Motion to Compel; granting 37 Motion to Compel. See Order for specifics. Proposed protective order due within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 31, 2014. (mll)
January 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 38 Report and Recommendations; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 23, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pankey et al v. Western Arkansas Rock, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Pankey
Represented By: James Sample Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith County Stone, LLC
Represented By: James Sample Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Arkansas Rock, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Landes Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Minerals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Potter
Represented By: Joshua Landes Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Joe Duffield
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke B. Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Western Arkansas Rock, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Landes Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Terrell Pankey
Represented By: James Sample Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Smith County Stone, LLC
Represented By: James Sample Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?