Wesson v. Tyson Foods Inc

Plaintiff: Andy Wesson
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv04066
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 22, 2015. (mll)
April 27, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 27, 2015. (mll)
March 24, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice on the Motion for Directed Verdict by Defendant, Tyson Foods,Inc. Judgment is hereby entered against Plaintiff, Andy Wesson, and for Defendant, Tyson Foods, Inc. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 24, 2015. (mfr)
February 25, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marshall S. Ney withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case; Attorney Marshall S. Ney terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 25, 2015. (mll)
September 5, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 5, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesson v. Tyson Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Wesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?