Cherry v. Southern Refrigerated Transport

Plaintiff: Ronald Cherry
Defendant: Southern Refrigerated Transport
Case Number: 4:2013cv04095
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 58 Report and Recommendation; granting 54 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 27, 2015. (mll)
February 19, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to answer all outstanding discovery requests made the subject of Defendant's Motion to Compel 33 no later than February 27, 2015. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 19, 2015. (mll)
February 12, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff is ordered to pay $500.00 in monetary sanctions to Defendant within 60 days of this Order. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 12, 2015. (mll)
February 3, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 3, 2015. (mll)
September 8, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 8, 2014. (mll)
April 21, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike 13 Response. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 21, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Southern Refrigerated Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Refrigerated Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?