Jackson et al v. JLS Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bettie Phillips Jackson, Jimmie Smith and Bobbie Phillips
Defendant: JLS Trucking, Inc., Freedom Trucking USA, LLC and Juan Martinez
Case Number: 4:2013cv04120
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Parties settled, case is dismissed pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2015. (mll)
May 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 Report and Recommendations; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 21, 2014. (mll)
April 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Adopt Separate Defendants Freedom Trucking USA, LLC and JLS Trucking, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Claims for Gross Negligence/Punitive Damages and Direct Liability. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 28, 2014. (mll)
January 27, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to refile their Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Defendants shall refile their Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 27, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. JLS Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettie Phillips Jackson
Represented By: James Craig Orr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Smith
Represented By: James Craig Orr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Phillips
Represented By: James Craig Orr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLS Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Trucking USA, LLC
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?