Solomon v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Clifton O. Solomon
Defendant: Allen Sanders and Dewayne Floyd
Case Number: 4:2013cv04126
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 87 . Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 29, 2015. (mll)
April 15, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 43 Motion to Strike; denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 62 Motion to Supplement; granting 63 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2015. (mll)
April 14, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 39 Motion to Compel; denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 47 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 48 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 49 Motion to Supplement; denying 50 Motion to Supplement; denying 51 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 54 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 57 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2015. (mll)
February 5, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 5, 2015. (mll)
January 27, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 27, 2015. (mll)
April 28, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Supplement; denying 9 Motion to Supplement; denying 10 Motion to Supplement; denying 12 Motion to Supplement; denying 14 Motion to Supplement; denying 15 Motion to Supplement; denying 17 Motion to Suppl ement; denying 18 Motion to Supplement; denying 19 Motion to Supplement; denying 22 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 23 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 24 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 25 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 26 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 28, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton O. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?