Keller et al v. FCOA, LLC
Plaintiff: William Keller, Debra Keller and Peggy Byrge
Defendant: FCOA, LLC and FCOA, LLC doing business as Foremost Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04002
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Filing 56 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller to #54 Memorandum Brief in Support,, of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55, #7 Exhibit 56 (under seal), #8 Exhibit 57 (under seal), #9 Exhibit 58 (under seal), #10 Exhibit 59 (under seal), #11 Exhibit 60 (under seal), #12 Exhibit 61 (under seal), #13 Exhibit 62 (under seal), #14 Exhibit 63 (under seal), #15 Exhibit 64, #16 Exhibit 65, #17 Exhibit 66 (under seal), #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 68, #20 Exhibit 69, #21 Exhibit 70, #22 Exhibit 71)(Weber, R.)
April 23, 2015 Filing 55 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller to #54 Memorandum Brief in Support,, of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 (under seal), #2 Exhibit 18 (under seal), #3 Exhibit 19 (under seal), #4 Exhibit 20 (under seal), #5 Exhibit 21 (under seal), #6 Exhibit 22 (under seal), #7 Exhibit 23 (under seal), #8 Exhibit 24 (under seal), #9 Exhibit 25 (under seal), #10 Exhibit 26 (under seal), #11 Exhibit 27 (under seal), #12 Exhibit 28 (under seal), #13 Exhibit 29 (under seal), #14 Exhibit 30 (under seal), #15 Exhibit 31 (under seal), #16 Exhibit 32 (under seal), #17 Exhibit 33 (under seal), #18 Exhibit 34 (under seal), #19 Exhibit 35 (under seal), #20 Exhibit 36 (under seal), #21 Exhibit 37 (under seal), #22 Exhibit 38 (under seal), #23 Exhibit 39 (under seal), #24 Exhibit 40 (under seal), #25 Exhibit 41 (under seal), #26 Exhibit 42 (under seal), #27 Exhibit 43 (under seal), #28 Exhibit 44 (under seal), #29 Exhibit 45, #30 Exhibit 46, #31 Exhibit 47, #32 Exhibit 48, #33 Exhibit 49)(Weber, R.)
April 23, 2015 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #53 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Weber, R.)
April 23, 2015 Filing 53 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. Responses due by 6/5/2015 (Weber, R.)
April 17, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION to Seal Document Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Weber, R.)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Extend Class Certification Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 2, 2015. (mll)
February 12, 2015 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Extend Class Certification Briefing Deadlilnes by FCOA, LLC. (Allen, Stacy)
January 28, 2015 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by FCOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Stacy Allen)(Allen, Stacy)
January 22, 2015 Filing 48 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 2/22/2016 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 22, 2015. (rwg)
January 21, 2015 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re Peggy Byrge filed by FCOA, LLC. (Allen, Stacy)
January 14, 2015 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Weber, R.)
January 14, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weber, R.)
January 9, 2015 Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER re #40 Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Deadlines; See Order for Specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 9, 2015. (cnn)
December 31, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE by FCOA, LLC re #42 Memorandum Brief in Support Corrected Certificate of Service (Allen, Stacy)
December 31, 2014 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re Plaintiff Peggy Byrge by FCOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Sylvia Ting)(Allen, Stacy)
December 31, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by FCOA, LLC. (Allen, Stacy)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 18, 2014. (mll)
December 17, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Austin Mattingly, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mattingly, Jack)
December 17, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanner Hicks on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hicks, Tanner)
December 16, 2014 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Final Scheduling Order by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller, FCOA, LLC. (Keil, D.) Modified to add filer on 12/17/2014. (mll)
October 27, 2014 Filing 36 AGREED ORDER Regarding Production of Certain Non-Party Claim Files #35 Motion for Order. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 27, 2014. (mll)
October 22, 2014 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Order by FCOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A proposed Agreed Order Re Production of Certain Non-Party Claim Files)(Allen, Stacy)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend/Correct; Jury Trial set for 10/26/2015 @ 9:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 20, 2014. (mll)
August 19, 2014 Filing 33 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Final Scheduling Order by Peggy Byrge, FCOA, LLC, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Allen, Stacy) Modified title on 8/20/2014. (mll)
August 1, 2014 Filing 32 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 1, 2014. (cnn)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Motion for Protective Order. The Court will enter the proposed Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 1, 2014. (ljl)
July 31, 2014 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by FCOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreed Protective Order)(Allen, Stacy)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Modify Class Certification Schedule. Plaintiffs must file their class certification motion on or before October 10, 2014. Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs class certification motion on or before November 21, 2014. The parties should note that the discovery deadline in this case is November 17, 2014. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 30, 2014. (mfr)
July 16, 2014 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Class Certification Schedule by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Keil, D.)
July 16, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Russo, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Russo, Richard)
July 16, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Mustokoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
July 16, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Martin Weber, Jr on behalf of Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Weber, R.)
July 15, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Pratt, Jr on behalf of Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Pratt, James)
June 23, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller of Change of Firm Name and Email Address (Engstrom, Stephen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 23 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 3/16/2015 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 18, 2014. (rwg)
May 30, 2014 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller, FCOA, LLC. (Norman, Richard) Modified to add filer on 5/30/2014. (mll)
March 25, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Appearance (Putman, William)
March 24, 2014 Filing 20 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. COUNSEL WILL FILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Putman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Putman, William) Modified text on 3/25/2014. (mll)
March 19, 2014 Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 5/5/2014. Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/30/2014. Jury Trial set for the week of 3/16/2015 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2014. (rwg)
January 22, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Norman on behalf of Debra Keller, William Keller. (Norman, Richard)
January 16, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Allen on behalf of FCOA, LLC. (Allen, Stacy)
January 16, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Rogers on behalf of FCOA, LLC. (Rogers, Thomas)
January 16, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thomas T. Rogers is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 16, 2014. (ljl)
January 16, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Stacy Allen is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 16, 2014. (ljl)
January 15, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Thomas T. Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000878) by FCOA, LLC. (mll)
January 15, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Stacy Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000877) by FCOA, LLC. (mll)
January 15, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McWilliams, George)
January 13, 2014 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Goodson, John)
January 10, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, A.F.)
January 10, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Castleberry, Kenneth)
January 8, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCOA, LLC.(Chambers, J.)
January 7, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Engstrom on behalf of Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Engstrom, Stephen)
January 6, 2014 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCOA, LLC. (Chambers, J.)
January 3, 2014 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to CM/ECF. (mll)
January 3, 2014 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant FCOA, LLC. Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Thomas T. Rogers, Stacy Allen, Audra G. Welter, Richard E. Griffin. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (mll)
January 3, 2014 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mll)
January 2, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Matt Keil on behalf of Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll)
January 2, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Goodson on behalf of Peggy Byrge, Debra Keller, William Keller. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll)
January 2, 2014 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against FCOA, LLC filed by William Keller, Debra Keller, Peggy Byrge. (mll)
January 2, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by FCOA, LLC. (mll)
January 2, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County Circuit Court, case number 46CV-13-276-1. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 4000853), filed by FCOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Johannes Bloem, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Michael T. Williams, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Margaret S. Giles, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of J. Dennis Chambers) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller et al v. FCOA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Keller
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Jack Austin Mattingly, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Matthew L. Mustokoff
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Tanner Hicks
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Stacy Allen
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Keller
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Jack Austin Mattingly, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Matthew L. Mustokoff
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Tanner Hicks
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Stacy Allen
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Byrge
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Jack Austin Mattingly, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Matthew L. Mustokoff
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Tanner Hicks
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Stacy Allen
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCOA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Stacy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCOA, LLC doing business as Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Stacy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?