Doss et al v. American Family Home Insurance Company
Plaintiff: B.G. Peavy and Lee Ann Doss
Defendant: American Family Home Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04007
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2014 Filing 62 MANDATE of USCA dismissing appeal as to #59 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Attachments: #1 8USCA Judgment) (mll)
November 4, 2014 Filing 61 USCA Scheduling Order as to #59 Notice of Appeal (atty), filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. Case Appealed to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 14-3488. (mll)
October 28, 2014 Filing 60 NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re #59 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (mll)
October 24, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #58 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. Filing fee $505.00, receipt number 0861-1064381. (cc via CM/ECF: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III, Andrew Samuels, D. Matt Keil, George McWilliams, James M. Pratt, Jr., Jason E. Roselius, John C. Goodson, Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry, Mark A. Johnson, Matthew L. Mustokoff, Richard E. Norman, Robert J. Tucker, Rodger L. Eckelberry, Sean M. Handler, Sharan Nirmul, Stephen C. Engstron, Stevan E. Vowell, Timothy J. Myers, W.H. Taylor, W. Kelvin Wyrick, Sr., William B. Putman.) (Goodson, John) Modified to note distribution on 10/28/2014. (mll)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed as time barred. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 25, 2014. (mll)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #24 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 19, 2014. (mll)
July 24, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Handler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Handler, Sean)
July 24, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Russo, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Russo, Richard)
July 24, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Mustokoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
July 24, 2014 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. Motion to Modify Class Certification Schedule #52 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Sean Handler, Matthew Mustokoff, Richard Russo, Jr.. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (mfr)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to modify the class certification schedule. Plaintiffs must file their class certification motion by December 4, 2014. Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs class certification motion by February 4, 2015. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 23, 2014. (mfr)
July 22, 2014 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Class Certification Schedule by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Keil, D.)
July 21, 2014 Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2014. (cnn)
July 21, 2014 Filing 50 ESI ORDER (Electronically Stored Information Order). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2014. (cnn)
July 21, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #49 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Establishing Protocol for Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2014. (ses)
July 21, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #48 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2014. (ses)
July 17, 2014 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Establishing Protocol for Production of Electronically Stored Information by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order Establishing Protocol for Production of Electronically Stored Information)(Eckelberry, Rodger)
July 17, 2014 Filing 48 Joint MOTION For Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information)(Eckelberry, Rodger)
July 15, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Pratt, Jr on behalf of Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Pratt, James)
June 20, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy of Change of Firm Name and Email Address (Engstrom, Stephen)
June 18, 2014 Filing 45 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 8/17/2015 @ 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 18, 2014. (rwg)
May 28, 2014 Filing 44 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy and American Family Home Insurance Company. (Keil, D.) Modified to add filer on 5/28/2014. (mll)
May 12, 2014 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Vowell, Stevan)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff shall file their reply within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 12, 2014. (mll)
May 6, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Tucker on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company. (Tucker, Robert)
May 5, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Robert J. Tucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000961) by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
May 5, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert J. Tucker is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 5, 2014. (ses)
May 2, 2014 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand #24 by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion to Remand)(Vowell, Stevan) Modified on 5/5/2014 to create link. (mll)
May 1, 2014 Filing 38 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT***. MOTION to Remand Motion to File Reply by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply)(Vowell, Stevan) Modified on 5/2/2014. (mll)
April 17, 2014 Filing 37 REPLY in Support re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark) Modified to edit text on 4/21/2014. (mll)
April 15, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Remand filed by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nicholas App for Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit B - Freeman App for Attorney Fees, #3 Exhibit C - Droste App for Attorney Fees)(Johnson, Mark)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Defendant shall file their reply within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 10, 2014. (mll)
April 9, 2014 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
April 7, 2014 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Entered in Vinson v Metropolitan Prop & Cas Ins Co)(Nirmul, Sharan)
April 7, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharan Nirmul on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nirmul, Sharan)
March 24, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #30 Notice of Appearance Substituted (Putman, William)
March 24, 2014 Filing 30 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. CORRECTED NOTICE FILED AT #31 *** NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Putman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Putman, William) Modified text on 3/25/2014. (mll)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 15, 2014. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 24, 2014. (mll)
March 20, 2014 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Remand by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2014. Plaintiff must respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on or before April 7, 2014. (mll)
March 19, 2014 Filing 26 Unopposed Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Keil, D.) Modified text on 3/19/2014. (mll)
March 19, 2014 Filing 25 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 5/5/2014. Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/30/2014. Jury Trial set for the week of 3/23/2015 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2014. (rwg)
March 18, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Vowell, Stevan)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to March 24, 2014. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 27, 2014. (mll)
February 26, 2014 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Goodson, John)
February 17, 2014 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arkansas Insurance Department Bulletin)(Johnson, Mark)
February 17, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
January 22, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Norman on behalf of Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Norman, Richard)
January 16, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, A.F.)
January 16, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Castleberry, Kenneth)
January 14, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McWilliams, George)
January 14, 2014 Filing 15 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Parties. (mll)
January 14, 2014 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Goodson, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Complaint First Amended by American Family Home Insurance Company.(Johnson, Mark)
January 10, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Evan Samuels on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company. (Samuels, Andrew)
January 10, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger L. Eckelberry on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company. (Eckelberry, Rodger)
January 10, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Johnson on behalf of American Family Home Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
January 7, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Engstrom on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Engstrom, Stephen)
January 7, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark A. Johnson is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 7, 2014. (ses)
January 7, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Rodger L. Eckelberry is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 7, 2014. (ses)
January 7, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrew E. Samuels is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 7, 2014. (ses)
January 6, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION for Andrew E. Samuels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000859) by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Rodger L. Eckelberry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000858) by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Mark A. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee received $100.00, receipt number 4000857) by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Home Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Midland-Guardian Co., Corporate Parent The Midland Company, Corporate Parent Munich American Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against American Family Home Insurance Company filed by Lee Ann Doss, B.G. Peavy. (Originally filed in state court) (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by American Family Home Insurance Company. (mll)
January 6, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County Circuit Court, case number 46CV-13-286-1. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 4000856), filed by American Family Home Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint and Summons Served, #2 Exhibit 2 - Miller County Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Denise Rice) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss et al v. American Family Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Tucker
Represented By: W. Kelvin Wyrick, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew Evan Samuels
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.G. Peavy
Represented By: Sean M. Handler
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: Matthew L. Mustokoff
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: William B. Putman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Ann Doss
Represented By: Sean M. Handler
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: Matthew L. Mustokoff
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: Richard A. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Sharan Nirmul
Represented By: William B. Putman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?