Larey et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Michael Larey, Toni Larey and Michael H. Larey
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04008
Filed: January 8, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Certify Class. Case stayed pending further order from the Court. (See Order for specific details.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 25, 2017. (mll)
December 10, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2015. (mll)
April 2, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss Party. Parties Michael Larey and Toni Larey Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 2, 2015. (mll)
March 16, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 16, 2015. (mll)
September 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss Case. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larey et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Larey
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Larey
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Larey
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?