Holt v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Holt
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04030
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 22 Motion to Remand. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Miller County, Arkansas, for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 22, 2014. (mll) Modified document title on 8/22/2014. (mll)
March 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Stay. If the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Plaintiff must respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment within fourteen (14) days of the entry of the order denying remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 17, 2014. (mll)
February 18, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Protective Order Quashing Defendant's Deposition Notices. Signed by Circuit Judge Brent Haltom on November 1, 2012. (Originally filed in state court) (mll)
February 12, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Brent Haltom on 9/24/12. (Originally filed in state court) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Holt
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Represented By: Sean F. Rommel
Represented By: John William Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?