Griffin et al v. Alamo et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Griffin, Marcus Griffin, Brooklynn Howard, Alsandra Reid, Alfonso Reid, Angela Ondrisek, Nicholas Broderick, Matthew Broderick, Marissa Broderick, Shaina Broderick, Nathan Griffin and Alexis Broderick
Defendant: Tony Alamo, Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation, Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc., Tony Alamo Christian Ministry, Armful of Help, Advantage Food Group, Advantage Sales, LLC, Action Distributors, Inc., Gloryland Christian Church, Junkin for Joy, Inc., Greg Seago, Angela Morales, Ron Decker, Sandford White, Don Wolf, Steve Lovellette, Tommy Scarcello and John Does I-XX
Case Number: 4:2014cv04065
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2016 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 30, 2016. (mll)
December 21, 2016 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 21, 2016. (mll)
September 27, 2016 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 313 Motion to Withdraw Request to Extend Time to Complete Discovery as to Expert Depositions and Disclosures. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 27, 2016. (mll)
September 20, 2016 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 246 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 20, 2016. (mll)
September 16, 2016 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 237 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 16, 2016. (mll)
August 30, 2016 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 153 Joint Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 30, 2016. (mll)
August 26, 2016 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 197 Motion to Make Alternative Service and to Extend Time to Make Service; granting 258 Motion to Supplement. (See Order for deadlines.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2016. (mll)
August 25, 2016 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 284 Motion to Seal Document [270-2] Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Expert Witness, [282-1] Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 25, 2016. (mll)
July 25, 2016 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 251 Motion for Joinder; denying as moot 253 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 25, 2016. (mll)
July 19, 2016 257 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 232 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party; to clarify that the dismissal is with prejudice between plaintiff and separate defendant Sanford White. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 19, 2016. (cnn)
June 30, 2016 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 224 Motion to Dismiss Party. Sandford White terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 30, 2016. (mll)
May 19, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 188 Motion to Strike 186 Sur-Reply of Plaintiffs. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 19, 2016. (mll)
September 14, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Separate Defendants Jeff Piniorini, Douglas Brubach, Levin Davis, Don Davis, Shimon Davis, Tony Alamo Christian Ministry, and Junkin for Joy, Inc. re 110 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party/Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 14, 2015. (mll)
June 16, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stuart P. Miller withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Action Distributors, Inc. and Tommy Scarcello. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 16, 2015. (mll)
April 8, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Plaintiffs' medical records, tax records, personnel records and social security records. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 8, 2015. (mll)
April 7, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Stay Pending Default Judgment Motion. Plaintiffs must supply the Court with a status report on the Motion for Default Judgment on or before June 1, 2015. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 7, 2015. (mll)
March 10, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Set Aside Default as to Defendants Tommy Scarcello, Sanford White, and Action Distributors. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 10, 2015. (mll)
February 13, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 55 MOTION to Stay re 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Tony Alamo a/k/a Bernie Hoffman by Vanessa Griffin. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 13, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Alamo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Griffin
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Griffin
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklynn Howard
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alsandra Reid
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Reid
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ondrisek
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Broderick
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Broderick
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Broderick
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaina Broderick
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Griffin
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Broderick
Represented By: Charles Daniel Hancock
Represented By: Jonathan T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Alamo Christian Ministry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armful of Help
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Food Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloryland Christian Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junkin for Joy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Seago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandford White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lovellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Scarcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?