Baker v. Tallant et al

Plaintiff: Lee Baker
Defendant: Jana Tallant, Nevada County, AR, Brian Cook, Howard County Sheriff's Department, Hector Cruz and Shelby Miller
Case Number: 4:2014cv04104
Filed: August 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court WITNESS ORDER re 59 Proposed Witness List. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 5, 2016. (mll)
June 8, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Order to Correspond with Inmates. Plaintiff is ordered to submit a revised witness list by June 30, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 8, 2016. (mll)
May 24, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Settlement Conference. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 24, 2016. (mll)
April 14, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2016. (mll)
August 7, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 Report and Recommendations; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 7, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Tallant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County, AR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?