Chesshir et al v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Michael Chesshir and Jennifer Chesshir
Defendant: Bradley Taylor, Molly Taylor, Janelle White and Taylor & Taylor Development, LLC
Counter_claimant: Taylor & Taylor Development, LLC
Counter_defendant: Jennifer Chesshir and Michael Chesshir
Case Number: 4:2014cv04109
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 1, 2015. (mll)
March 23, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 23, 2015. (mll)
March 20, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2015. (mll)
March 18, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 18, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesshir et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chesshir
Represented By: J. Don Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chesshir
Represented By: J. Don Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Taylor
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Christy Lynn Samansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Taylor
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Christy Lynn Samansky
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle White
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Christy Lynn Samansky
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor & Taylor Development, LLC
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Christy Lynn Samansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Taylor & Taylor Development, LLC
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Christy Lynn Samansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jennifer Chesshir
Represented By: J. Don Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Chesshir
Represented By: J. Don Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?