Adams v. Hempstead County et al

Plaintiff: Steven Paul Adams
Defendant: Hempstead County, Hempstead County Quorum Court, Wallace Martin, Sandra Rogers, James Singleton, Johnny Godbolt, Heath Ross, Cecila Bland, Max Field and Cody Aaron
Case Number: 4:2014cv04117
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing all claims against Defendants. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 10, 2016. (mll)
March 29, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 36 Plaintiff's Witness List - Trial/Hearing. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 29, 2016. (mll)
March 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to Supplement his 28 Proposed Witness List by Friday, April 18, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 4, 2016. (mll)
February 25, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 25, 2016. (mll)
April 16, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 16, 2015. (mll)
February 13, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Report and Recommendations. Hempstead County, Hempstead County Quorum Court, Wallace Martin, Sandra Rogers, Heath Ross, Cecila Bland and Johnny Godbolt terminated. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Sheriff James Singleton, Officer Max Field, and Officer CodyAaron may proceed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 13, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Hempstead County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead County Quorum Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Godbolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecila Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?