Waites v. Housing Opportunities Extension, Inc.

Plaintiff: Terri Waites
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Extension, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04026
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' request to file settlement agreement under seal re 43 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case and for Leave to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal. (The Motion for Approval of Settlement remains pending.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 18, 2016. (mll)
May 31, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing bench trial. Trial to be re-set at a later date. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 31, 2016. (mll)
April 13, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2016. (mll)
March 1, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waites v. Housing Opportunities Extension, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Waites
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Extension, Inc.
Represented By: Winford L. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?