Davis v. Hempstead County Detention Facility et al

Plaintiff: Kerry Davis
Defendant: Hempstead County Detention Facility, Heath Ross, James Singleton, Johnny Godbolt and Joan McClain
Case Number: 4:2015cv04034
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff given until July 1, 2016 to file a notice of appeal. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 1, 2016. (mll)
May 18, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Kerry Davis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 18, 2016. (mll)
April 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 19, 2016. (mll)
April 16, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Kerry Davis; granting 5 Motion for Service and DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Johnny Godbolt, Joan McClain, Heath Ross, James Singleton and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 16, 2015. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hempstead County Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Godbolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?