Tiller v. McAllester et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Tiller
Defendant: McAllester, R. Wise, McAlister, Jerry Bradshaw, Britney Carter, Janet Myers, Veigeas and Conny Mason
Case Number: 4:2015cv04040
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 23, 2017. (mll)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 61 ; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 6, 2017. (mll)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 55 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 16, 2016. (mll)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER to communicate with the Court upon receipt of Order. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 31, 2016. (mll)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Rescind Order; denying 35 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 36 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; granting 37 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 38 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; granting 39 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff directed to provide discovery responses and executed medical authorization to opposing counsel by 5:00 p.m. on March 21, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 26, 2016. (mll)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing correction of Defendant's names. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2015. (mll)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 ; granting 9 and 21 Motion(s) to Dismiss; separate defendants Deputy Director Bradshaw, Sergeant Brenda McAllester and Britney Carter are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 22, 2015. (cnn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiller v. McAllester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAllester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veigeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conny Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?