Shiheiber v. Street & Performance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nimer Shiheiber
Defendant: Street & Performance, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04043
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 77 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, Alternatively, Motion for New Trial on Damages. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 19, 2019. (mll)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT in favor of Nimer Shiheiber against Griffin Thermal Products, Inc. in the amount of $100.00 in accordance with Jury Verdict 73 . Signed on February 26, 2018. (cnn)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2017. (mll)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion in Limine. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 22, 2016. (mll)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 ; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 26, 2016. (mll)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 5, 2015. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiheiber v. Street & Performance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nimer Shiheiber
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street & Performance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?