Martin v. Floyd et al

Plaintiff: Cedric D. Martin
Defendant: Dewayne Floyd, N. Brown and Golden Adams
Case Number: 4:2015cv04059
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 ; granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against all Defendants are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 7, 2016. (mll)
May 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to mail documents he wishes to use as exhibits at the Motion for Summary Judgment hearing and advising of his intent to appear no later than June 2, 2016. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 24, 2016. (mll)
December 11, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 19 ; separate defendant Brown is dismissed without prejudice. Claims against other defendants will proceed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 11, 2015. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Floyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?