Munn et al v. Hunt et al

Plaintiff: Willie Munn and Mary Eliza Munn
Defendant: Crissy Hunt, Casey Parker, Dustin Wakefield, Joe Kuhn, Ashley Vailes and Arkansas Parole Board & Government
Case Number: 4:2015cv04072
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 26 dismissing claims against all Defendants. The dismissal shall be counted as a strike for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 5, 2017. (mll)
May 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying as moot 18 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; ORDER Granting IFP, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Willie Munn. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 24, 2016. (mll)
May 18, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating motion 21 MOTION to Withdraw 17 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 18, 2016. (mll)
April 14, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Willie Munn, Mary Eliza Munn. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2016. (mll)
January 7, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Supplement; denying 9 Motion to Supplement; denying 10 Motion to Supplement; denying 11 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 7, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munn et al v. Hunt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Eliza Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crissy Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Vailes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Parole Board & Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?