Lee v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Donzell Lee
Defendant: Patterson and Miller
Case Number: 4:2015cv04102
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 69 ; granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2017. (mll)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 49 Motion to Compel ; denying 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 12, 2016. (mll)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 49 MOTION to Compel filed by Patrick Donzell Lee. Defendants are to search for any additional documents involving Defendant Patterson during his employment with the Miller County Detention Center. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 14, 2016. (mll)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Supplement. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement as a supplement to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 25, 2016. (mll)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Officer Patterson and Sergeant Miller and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 22, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Donzell Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?