Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company v. Paradise Club et al

Plaintiff: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Paradise Club, Ismael Aranda and Brandi Coody
Case Number: 4:2015cv04103
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 21, 2017. (mll)
February 21, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 21, 2017. (mll)
November 8, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 8, 2016. (mll)
November 4, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 4, 2016. (mll)
September 7, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Relief. Separate Defendants Paradise Club and Ismael Aranda shall have fourteen days from the date of this order to move or plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 7, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company v. Paradise Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashleigh Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismael Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Coody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?