Deloney et al v. Chase et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Deloney and Peggy Deloney
Defendant: Dennis Chase, Chasemaster Corporation, William Hallack, Jr., Ronald Novack, Jr. and Juli Anne Novack
Case Number: 4:2015cv04104
Filed: November 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Little River
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jerry Deloney, Peggy Deloney against Chasemaster Corporation, Dennis Chase in the total amount of $148,047.00. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 11, 2017. (mll)
February 1, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Default Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 30 Supplemental Motion for Default Judgment. (Damages Hearing set for 5/26/2017 09:00 AM in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 1, 2017. (mll)
August 30, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant William Hallack, Jr. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 30, 2016. (mll)
April 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Party. Separate Defendants Juli Anne Novack and Ronald Novack, Jr. Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 28, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deloney et al v. Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Deloney
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Prazak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Deloney
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Prazak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasemaster Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hallack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Novack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juli Anne Novack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?