Braden et al v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Plaintiff: David Braden and Dale Brown
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 4:2015cv04114
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 108 Agreed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Class Certification for Settlement Purposes, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 21, 2018. (See Order for specifics.)(mll)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 77 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 90 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 25, 2017. (mll)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 15, 2017. (mll)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 5, 2017. (mll)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Unopposed Motion to File Redacted Portions of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification and to File Certain Confidential Exhibits Under Seal. Plaintiffs are directed to provide the Court with unredacted copies of the memorandum and exhibits. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 23, 2017. (mll)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Agreed Motion Regarding Procedure to Issue Subpoenas. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 17, 2017. (mll)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Seal Document. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 28, 2016. (mll)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Production of Certain Non-Party Claim Files. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 8, 2016. (mll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braden et al v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Braden
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Brown
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?