Rabon et al v. Kimani et al

Plaintiff: Terrance Rabon and Kathleen Rabon
Defendant: John K. Kimani, Tolyn Express, LLC and John Does 1-6
Case Number: 4:2016cv04007
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding designated deposition testimony. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 14, 2017. (mll)
September 11, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 MOTION to Limit Testimony re Plaintiffs Evidence of Medical Expenses filed by John K. Kimani, Tolyn Express, LLC. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 11, 2017. (mll)
September 7, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to file their responses re 41 MOTION in Limine on or before September 13, 2017. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 7, 2017. (mll)
September 6, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file their responses re 46 MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Sentry Subrogation Claim, 49 MOTION to Limit Testimony re Plaintiffs Evidence of Medical Expenses on or before September 13, 2017. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 6, 2017. (mll)
October 12, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Intervene. Sentry Select is ordered to file its Complaint in Intervention within seven days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 12, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabon et al v. Kimani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Rabon
Represented By: Brett McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Rabon
Represented By: Brett McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Kimani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tolyn Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?