Gray v. McClure et al

Plaintiff: Kelvin Gray
Defendant: Sergeant McClure, D. Floyd, Ron Stovall, M. Brazell, M. Moon and L. Mauldin
Case Number: 4:2016cv04021
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Sevier
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 6, 2016. (mll)
August 5, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 8 Order of Dismissal and directing the Clerk to reopen this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 5, 2016. (mll)
July 14, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 14, 2016. (mll)
March 14, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re TEXT ONLY ENTRY: MEMORANDUM OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 2 Application to Proceed IFP (42:1983) filed by Kelvin Gray. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 14, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. McClure et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Brazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?