Randle v. Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority et al

Plaintiff: Chimeka Randle
Defendant: Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority and RichSmith Development LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv04025
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 8, 2017. (mll)
February 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2017. (mll)
August 23, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations and denying 17 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2016. (tg)
August 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 5, 2016. (mll)
May 10, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on RichSmith Development LLC, Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 10, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randle v. Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimeka Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RichSmith Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?