White v. McJunkins et al

Plaintiff: Eric L. White
Defendant: Brian McJunkins, Jana Tallant, Dawanda Schwope, Gregory L. Vardaman and Dr. H. Patel
Case Number: 4:2016cv04061
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss Case. Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 27, 2017. (mll)
December 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendants with required responses to discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on December 30, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 15, 2016. (mll)
September 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 10 . Plaintiff's claims against Jana Tallant and Jailer Dawanda Schwope shall proceed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 28, 2016. (mll)
August 9, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reinstating 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric L. White. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 9, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. McJunkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McJunkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawanda Schwope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Vardaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. H. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?