Godbold v. Reynolds

Plaintiff: Marquis Jermane Godbold
Defendant: Kraig Reynolds
Case Number: 4:2016cv04069
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 15, 2017. (mll)
May 31, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is to produce responses to Defendants discovery requests by June 15, 2017. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 31, 2017. (mll)
March 28, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff to provide Defendants with required responses to discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 11, 2017. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 28, 2017. (mll)
February 27, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 27, 2017. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godbold v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Jermane Godbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraig Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?