McReynolds v. Glenn et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Franklin McReynolds
Defendant: Preston Glenn and Christopher Wattingny
Case Number: 4:2016cv04122
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect appellate filing fee from Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 23, 2018. (mll)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT denying 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiffs claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 27, 2018. (cnn)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 90 Motion to Summons Witnesses. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 26, 2018. (mll)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2017. (mll)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 71 ; Christopher Wattingny (Doctor, Wadley Medical Center) dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 19, 2017. (cnn)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 74 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 26, 2017. (Document mailed to non-ECF Participant Bobby Franklin McReynolds.) (mll)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 64 ; granting 38 and [59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; claims against WRMC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 21, 2017. (cnn)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff given until May 31, 2017 to provide the Court with proper service address for Defendant Wattingny. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 17, 2017. (mll)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Bobby Franklin McReynolds. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 6, 2017. (mll)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER regarding briefing re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Whattley Medical Center. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 4, 2017. (mll)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Specialist Examination. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 28, 2017. (mll)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer McReynolds' entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/21/2016. (mef)[Transferred from ared on 12/21/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McReynolds v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Franklin McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Glenn
Represented By: John R. Myers
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wattingny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?