Tillman v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Devonna Tillman and Fricks
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04030
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Tompkins on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Tompkins, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jason B. Tompkins is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 12, 2019. (res)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Jason B. Tompkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number BARWDC-1945278) by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
July 10, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading #14 Motion for Judgment lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Jason B. Tompkins. (mll)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shannon, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendants' answers due 7/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 24, 2019. (mll)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devonna Tillman. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devonna Tillman. Midland Funding LLC served on 5/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Midland Funding LLC's answers due 6/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 20, 2019. (mll)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Midland Funding LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Midland Funding LLC for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) Modified docket text on 4/10/2019. (mll)
March 25, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1888109.. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 20, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/22/2019 (hnc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (hnc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Devonna Tillman. (hnc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1-25, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC, filed by Devonna Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letter)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonna Tillman
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fricks
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Shannon
Represented By: Jason B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michael N. Shannon
Represented By: Jason B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?