Kendrick v. Miller

Plaintiff: Hosea L. Kendrick
Defendant: Sergeant Thomas G. Miller
Case Number: 4:2019cv04040
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO MOTION #13 TO DISMISS. On June 17, 2019 Defendants filed a Motion to Dismiss, along with a brief in support. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion.Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 17, 2019. (mlf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 17, 2019. (mlf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Thomas G. Miller. (Hays, Caroline)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Thomas G. Miller. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Hays, Caroline)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Burt Newell on behalf of Thomas G. Miller. (Newell, C.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas G. Miller.(Hays, Caroline)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Answer out of Time by Thomas G. Miller. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Hays, Caroline)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Hosea L. Kendrick. There are no documents to resend. (mll)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 FORM/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hosea L. Kendrick. Thomas G. Miller served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (cnn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Nevada County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $19.83; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Thomas G. Miller and USM285 Form Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #5 Order Directing Service. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Thomas G. Miller and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 15, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service). (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 15, 2019. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Hosea L. Kendrick. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Thomas G. Miller filed by Hosea L. Kendrick. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Thomas G. Miller
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Caroline Virginia Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea L. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?