Francisco v. United Steel Workers Local 752
Plaintiff: Phalanza S. Francisco
Defendant: United Steel Workers Local 752
Case Number: 4:2019cv04059
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants. (Shapiro, Sasha)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sasha Shapiro is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 9, 2019. (res)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Sasha Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1942981) by United Steel Workers Local 752. (McGowan, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Amended Answer by United Steel Workers Local 752.(McGowan, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United Steel Workers Local 752.(McGowan, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phalanza S. Francisco. United Steel Workers Local 752 served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (mll)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Defendant United Steel Workers Local 752 and USM285 Forms Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order on Motion for Service. (mll) Modified to correct docket text on 6/7/2019. (mll)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on United Steel Workers Local 752. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 5, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1 for full pretrial/dispositive motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 4, 2019. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Phalanza S. Francisco. (mll)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Steel Workers Local 752 filed by Phalanza S. Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco v. United Steel Workers Local 752
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phalanza S. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel Workers Local 752
Represented By: Thomas H. McGowan
Represented By: Sasha Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?