White v. Runion
Petitioner: Anthony Scott White
Respondent: Jackie Runion
Case Number: 4:2019cv04083
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 . Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 18, 2019. (mll)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender. Not here. Mail originally sent to Anthony Scott White at Miller County Detention Center including #5 Report and Recommendations. No new address available. (mll)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Scott White. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 26, 2019. (mll)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing Fee due by 8/23/2019; ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus be filed by 8/23/19. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 29, 2019. (mll) Modified to correct signing judge on 8/12/2019. (mll)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Scott White. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Scott White.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jackie Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Scott White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?