Williams v. Lindsey Management Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amena Williams
Defendant: Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC, Lindsey Management Co., Inc. and The Links of Texarkana
Case Number: 4:2019cv04092
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Release, and Lack of Jurisdiction by Lindsey Management Co., Inc.. (Potter, Jacob)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Release, and Lack of Jurisdiction by The Links of Texarkana. (Potter, Joshua)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC. (Golden, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lindsey Management Co., Inc., Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC, The Links of Texarkana and USM285 Forms Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #4 Order on Motion for Service. (mll)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Lindsey Management Co., Inc., Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC, The Links of Texarkana. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 6, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
August 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Amena Williams. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Amena Williams. (mll)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lindsey Management Co., Inc., Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC, The Links of Texarkana filed by Amena Williams.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lindsey Management Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Golden Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By: Matthew F. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Links of Texarkana
Represented By: Joshua Landes Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amena Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?