Harris v. Bradley, Arkansas
Plaintiff: Patricia Harris
Defendant: City of Bradley, Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2019cv04145
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 16, 2020. (mll)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint against City of Bradley, Arkansas , filed by Patricia Harris. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Patricia Harris.(Sanford, Josh)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by City of Bradley, Arkansas. (LaFever, Amanda)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by City of Bradley, Arkansas. (LaFever, Amanda)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to City of Bradley, Arkansas and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to City of Bradley, Arkansas for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Patricia Harris ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BARWDC-2022641), filed by Patricia Harris.(Sanford, Josh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Patricia Harris. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Bradley, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Harris
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bradley, Arkansas
Represented By: Amanda M. LaFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?